Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2535 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Sanford, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2535
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of real
 property that includes certain improvements used for the
 noncommercial production of food for personal consumption.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.014, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 23.014.  EXCLUSION OF PROPERTY AS REAL PROPERTY.
 Except as provided by Section 23.24(b), in determining the market
 value of real property, the chief appraiser shall analyze the
 effect on that value of, and exclude from that value the value of,
 any:
 (1)  tangible personal property, including trade
 fixtures;
 (2)  intangible personal property; [or]
 (3)  chicken coops or rabbit pens used for the
 noncommercial production of food for personal consumption; or
 (4)  other property that is not subject to appraisal as
 real property.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to the appraisal of
 property for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *