Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2625 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Noble, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2625
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 13,
 Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excluding the furnishing of an academic transcript from
 the definition of "information service" for purposes of sales and
 use taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.0038, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  "Information service" does not include the furnishing
 of an academic transcript.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect October 1, 2021.
 * * * * *