Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2664 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/03/2021

                    87R10426 TSS-F
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 2664


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of an independent school district to
 change the date of the general election and terms for officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.059, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Not later than December 31, 2026, the board of trustees
 may adopt a resolution changing the length of the terms of its
 trustees. The resolution must provide for staggered terms of either
 three or four years and specify the manner in which the transition
 from the length of the former term to the modified term is made. The
 transition must begin with the first regular election for trustees
 that occurs after the board adopts the resolution, and a trustee who
 serves on the date the resolution is adopted shall serve the
 remainder of that term. This subsection expires January 1, 2032.
 SECTION 2.  Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The governing body of an independent school district
 that holds its general election for officers on a date other than
 the November uniform election date may, not later than December 31,
 2026, change the date on which it holds its general election for
 officers to the November uniform election date. This subsection
 expires January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.