Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2664 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Martinez, Reynolds H.B. No. 2664


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of an independent school district to
 change the date of the general election and terms for officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.059, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Not later than December 31, 2026, the board of trustees
 may adopt a resolution changing the length of the terms of its
 trustees until the date the November election is canvassed. The
 resolution must provide for staggered terms of either three or four
 years and specify the manner in which the transition from the length
 of the former term to the modified term is made. The transition
 must begin with the first regular election for trustees that occurs
 after the board adopts the resolution, and a trustee who serves on
 the date the resolution is adopted shall serve the remainder of that
 term. This subsection expires January 1, 2032.
 SECTION 2.  Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The governing body of an independent school district
 that holds its general election for officers on a date other than
 the November uniform election date may, not later than December 31,
 2026, change the date on which it holds its general election for
 officers to the November uniform election date. This subsection
 expires January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.