Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2671 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    87R23982 CJC-D
 By: Guillen, Shaheen H.B. No. 2671
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2671:
 By:  Paddie C.S.H.B. No. 2671


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operations, communications, and notice procedures
 of state agencies and political subdivisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 322, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 322.025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 322.025.  STUDY ON MAIL OPERATIONS. (a) The board
 shall conduct a study on the mail operations of each state agency in
 the executive branch of state government that receives an
 appropriation. The study must identify provisions of law relating
 to the mailing requirements for the agency that impede the
 efficient transmission and receipt of documents by the agency.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the board shall collaborate
 with other state agencies to consider the needs or concerns
 specific to those agencies.
 (c)  Not later than November 1, 2022, the board shall post
 the findings of the study conducted under this section on the
 board's Internet website.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 441, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 441.0135 to read as follows:
 Sec. 441.0135. REPORT OF REPORTS. (a) Not later than January
 1 of each odd-numbered year, the commission shall submit to the
 governor and the Legislative Budget Board a written report
 regarding all statutorily required reports prepared by and
 submitted to a state agency as defined by Section 441.180. The
 commission may consult with other state agencies in preparing the
 report. A state agency shall cooperate with the commission in
 securing the information necessary to prepare the report. The
 commission shall prescribe the method by which a state agency
 transmits to the commission information necessary to prepare the
 report, and may require the information to be submitted using the
 state electronic Internet portal. The report must include for each
 statutorily required report:
 (1)  the title of and the agency preparing the report;
 (2)  the statutory authority requiring the report;
 (3)  the recipient of the report;
 (4)  the deadline for submitting the report;
 (5)  a brief description of the report; and
 (6)  an assessment from each recipient of the report
 whether the report is necessary.
 (b)  The report required by Subsection (a) must be:
 (1)  made available to the public; and
 (2)  indexed by preparing agency, title of report, and
 report recipient.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter L, Chapter 441, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 441.1856 to read as follows:
 Sec. 441.1856.  TEXAS DIGITAL ARCHIVE. (a) The commission
 shall maintain and operate a digital repository for the
 preservation of and access to permanently valuable archival state
 records, reports, and publications.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the Department of
 Information Resources, shall develop a strategy, consistent with
 state records management and archival practices, for state agencies
 to transfer appropriate archival state records and publications
 that are in electronic format to the commission for inclusion in the
 digital repository described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 4.  Section 2001.026, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2001.026.  NOTICE TO PERSONS REQUESTING ADVANCE NOTICE
 OF PROPOSED RULES. A state agency shall provide [mail] notice of a
 proposed rule to each person who has made a timely written request
 of the agency for advance notice of its rulemaking proceedings. The
 agency may provide the notice by e-mail if the person requests
 electronic delivery of the notice and includes an e-mail address in
 the person's written request submitted to the agency. Failure to
 provide [mail] the notice does not invalidate an action taken or
 rule adopted.
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 2052, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. TRANSMISSION AND RECEIPT OF AGENCY DOCUMENTS
 Sec. 2052.401.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "state
 agency" means a department, commission, board, office, council,
 authority, or other agency that is in the executive, legislative,
 or judicial branch of state government and that is created by the
 constitution or a statute of this state, including a university
 system or institution of higher education as defined by Section
 61.003, Education Code.
 Sec. 2052.402.  TRANSMISSION AND RECEIPT OF DOCUMENTS. (a)
 A state agency may transmit and receive state documents in a format
 prescribed by the agency and in any manner that the agency
 determines will increase agency efficiency without compromising
 the delivery of the agency's program to the public.
 (b)  A state agency that transmits and receives state
 documents using the Internet or another electronic medium shall by
 rule develop electronic communication procedures for the agency.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, a state
 agency may continue to use established procedures prescribed by
 state law or agency policy for the transmission and receipt of
 documents, including the delivery of certain publications that
 exist in physical format to a depository library as required by
 Section 441.103.
 (d)  This section does not authorize the electronic
 transmission or receipt of documents that are prohibited from being
 electronically transmitted or received under federal law.
 (e)  To the extent of any conflict, this section prevails
 over any other state law relating to the transmission and receipt of
 state agency documents.
 (f)  A state agency shall include in the agency's legislative
 appropriations request submitted to the Legislative Budget Board
 for the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2023, a report
 on any cost savings or achievements in efficiency recognized from
 implementing a change in the agency's procedures for the
 transmission and receipt of state documents during the state fiscal
 biennium ending August 31, 2023. This subsection expires September
 1, 2024.
 SECTION 6.  Section 243.015, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsections (e-1) and
 (e-2) to read as follows:
 (e)  If the department initially determines that a violation
 occurred, the department shall give written notice of the report
 [by certified mail] to the person. Notwithstanding any other law,
 the notice may be provided by any certified delivery method,
 including certified mail or certified e-mail.
 (e-1)  If the notice under Subsection (e) is sent by
 certified e-mail:
 (1)  it must be sent to the person's last known e-mail
 address as provided by the person to the department; and
 (2)  the department shall maintain proof that the
 notice was sent.
 (e-2)  For purposes of Subsection (e), a person's provision
 of an e-mail address to the department is considered consent to
 electronically deliver notices and correspondence to the person.
 SECTION 7.  Section 11.082(a), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A state agency or political subdivision may not formally
 take any action that may affect state land dedicated to the
 permanent school fund without first giving notice of the action to
 the board. Notice of the proposed action shall be delivered [by
 certified mail, return receipt requested, addressed to the deputy
 commissioner of the asset management division of the General Land
 Office] on or before the state agency's or political subdivision's
 formal initiation of the action by:
 (1)  certified mail, return receipt requested,
 addressed to the deputy commissioner of the asset management
 division of the General Land Office; or
 (2)  certified e-mail to an e-mail address specified by
 the deputy commissioner for the purpose of receiving the notice.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act relating to
 the method of delivery or submission of a notice or report apply
 only to a notice or report that is required to be delivered or
 submitted on or after the effective date of this Act.  A notice or
 report required to be delivered or submitted before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 notice or report was required to be delivered or submitted, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.