Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2678 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2021

                    By: Bonnen (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2678
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; April 22, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of State Highway 3 in
 Dickinson as the Sergeant Andrew James Creighton Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.190 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.190.  SERGEANT ANDREW JAMES CREIGHTON MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion of State Highway 3 in the municipal
 limits of Dickinson is designated as the Sergeant Andrew James
 Creighton Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Sergeant Andrew James Creighton Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *