Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2893 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2893
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment by the Texas Department of Housing
 and Community Affairs of colonia self-help centers in certain
 counties and to the representation of those counties on the Colonia
 Resident Advisory Committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.582(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall establish colonia self-help
 centers in El Paso, Hidalgo, Nueces, Starr, and Webb Counties
 [counties], and in Cameron County to serve Cameron and Willacy
 Counties [counties]. If the department determines it necessary and
 appropriate, the department may establish a self-help center in any
 other county if the county is designated as an economically
 distressed area under Chapter 17, Water Code, for purposes of
 eligibility to receive funds from the Texas Water Development
 Board.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2306.584(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall appoint not fewer than six [five]
 persons who are residents of colonias to serve on the Colonia
 Resident Advisory Committee. The members of the advisory committee
 shall be selected from lists of candidates submitted to the board by
 local nonprofit organizations and the commissioners court of a
 county in which a self-help center is located.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *