Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2911 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: White, Stephenson (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2911
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2911 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to next generation 9-1-1 service and the establishment of
 a next generation 9-1-1 service fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 771.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivisions (5-a) and (5-b) and amending
 Subdivision (6) to read as follows:
 (5-a)  "Next generation 9-1-1 service" has the meaning
 assigned by 47 U.S.C. Section 942.
 (5-b)  "Next generation 9-1-1 service fund" means the
 next generation 9-1-1 service fund established under Section
 771.0713.
 (6)  "9-1-1 service" means a communications service
 that connects users to a public safety answering point through a
 9-1-1 system.  The term includes next generation 9-1-1 service.
 SECTION 2.  Section 771.059, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 771.059.  TARGET DATE [DEADLINE] FOR STATEWIDE NEXT
 GENERATION 9-1-1 SERVICE. Before September 1, 2025 [1995], all
 parts of the state must be covered by next generation 9-1-1 service.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 771, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 771.0713 to read as follows:
 Sec. 771.0713.  NEXT GENERATION 9-1-1 SERVICE FUND. (a) The
 next generation 9-1-1 service fund is created as a fund in the state
 treasury outside the general revenue fund.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law and except as provided by
 federal law, the comptroller shall transfer to the credit of the
 next generation 9-1-1 service fund any amount available from
 federal money provided to this state from the Coronavirus State and
 Local Fiscal Recovery Funds under Section 9901 of the American
 Rescue Plan Act of 2021 (Pub. L. No. 117-2) or from any other
 federal governmental source for purposes of this chapter. The
 comptroller shall transfer the money as soon as practicable
 following the receipt by this state of a sufficient amount of
 federal money for the transfer.
 (c)  Money deposited to the credit of the next generation
 9-1-1 service fund may be used only for the purpose of supporting
 the deployment and reliable operation of next generation 9-1-1
 service, including the costs of equipment, operations, and
 administration. Money in the fund may be distributed to only the
 commission and emergency communication districts and must be used
 in a manner that complies with federal law.
 (d)  Interest earned on money deposited to the credit of the
 next generation 9-1-1 service fund is exempt from Section 404.071,
 Government Code. Interest on money in the fund shall be retained in
 the fund.
 (e)  The comptroller may issue guidelines for use by the
 commission and emergency communication districts in implementing
 this section.
 (f)  All money in the fund shall be distributed in accordance
 with this section not later than December 31, 2022, and all money
 distributed under this section shall be spent not later than
 December 31, 2024, for the deployment and reliable operation of
 next generation 9-1-1 service.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 771.0711(g) and (j), Health and Safety
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the comptroller
 of public accounts shall adopt rules necessary to establish and
 administer the next generation 9-1-1 service fund established under
 Section 771.0713, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *