Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB30 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Talarico, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 30
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to educational programs provided by the Windham School
 District in the Texas Department of Criminal Justice for certain
 inmates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 19, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Section 19.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 19.0051.  EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMS.  (a)  The Windham
 School District shall develop and provide an educational program
 that includes the curriculum requirements for a high school diploma
 under Section 28.025 or a course of instruction that prepares the
 person for the high school equivalency examination to each person
 confined or imprisoned in the department who is not a high school
 graduate and is:
 (1)  younger than 18 years of age; or
 (2)  eligible to receive special education services
 under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, and younger than 22 years of age.
 (b)  In developing a person's educational program under
 Subsection (a), the Windham School District shall consider:
 (1)  the duration of the person's confinement or
 imprisonment;
 (2)  the person's current level of education;
 (3)  the person's educational goals and preference; and
 (4)  if applicable, recommendations of the person's
 admission, review, and dismissal committee.
 (c)  The board may adopt rules as necessary to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *