Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3081 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/28/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             March 28, 2021       TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB3081 by Krause (Relating to the issuance of digital tags for the taking of certain animals.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3081, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2022$02023$02024$02025$02026$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGame,Fish,Water Safety Ac9 Change in Number of State Employees from FY 20212022($1,316,601)6.52023($694,903)6.52024($694,903)6.52025($694,903)6.52026($694,903)6.5 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to require the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) to develop and implement a program for the issuance of digital tags for animals, including birds, to holders of hunting licenses. The digital tag program would be required to provide for the electronic issuance of appropriate digital tags to the holder of the license; allow the holder of the license to create a digital record at the time of harvesting the animal that includes the date, location, and a photo of the harvested animal and any other information required by the department; and require the license holder to upload the digital record to a mobile application. The license holder would be required to retain the digital record in their possession at all times before the animal is at its final destination point for processing. The bill would require TPWD to adopt rules no later than September 1, 2022. This bill would be effective September 1, 2021, or immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 28, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB3081 by Krause (Relating to the issuance of digital tags for the taking of certain animals.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3081 by Krause (Relating to the issuance of digital tags for the taking of certain animals.), As Introduced

 Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism

 Honorable Ken King, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB3081 by Krause (Relating to the issuance of digital tags for the taking of certain animals.), As Introduced 

 HB3081 by Krause (Relating to the issuance of digital tags for the taking of certain animals.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3081, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3081, As Introduced : an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2022 $0
2023 $0
2024 $0
2025 $0
2026 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2022 ($1,316,601) 6.5
2023 ($694,903) 6.5
2024 ($694,903) 6.5
2025 ($694,903) 6.5
2026 ($694,903) 6.5

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to require the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) to develop and implement a program for the issuance of digital tags for animals, including birds, to holders of hunting licenses. The digital tag program would be required to provide for the electronic issuance of appropriate digital tags to the holder of the license; allow the holder of the license to create a digital record at the time of harvesting the animal that includes the date, location, and a photo of the harvested animal and any other information required by the department; and require the license holder to upload the digital record to a mobile application. The license holder would be required to retain the digital record in their possession at all times before the animal is at its final destination point for processing. The bill would require TPWD to adopt rules no later than September 1, 2022. This bill would be effective September 1, 2021, or immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house.



This bill would be effective September 1, 2021, or immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house.

 Methodology

Based on information provided by TPWD, it is assumed that 6.5 FTEs would be needed for the development, maintenance, and support of the digital tag program: 2.0 Systems Support Specialist II at $40,240 per year; 2.0 Customer Service Representative IV at $45,240 per year; 1.0 Programmer III at $80,240 per year; 0.5 Systems Analyst IV at $30,120 per year; 0.5 Quality Assurance Specialist II at $30,120 per year; and 0.5 Database Administrator III at $40,120 per year. Total salary, benefits and other costs associated with this FTEs would be $556,601 in fiscal year 2022 and $474,903 each subsequent year. It is also assumed that additional contracted developers would be needed for the first year to develop the digital tag at a cost of $540,000. Annual technology costs, detailed below, would total an additional $220,000 per year.

 Technology

Technology costs, including IT testing tools, help desk software, security testing and servers, would be $220,000 per year.

 Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 802 Parks and Wildlife Department

802 Parks and Wildlife Department

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AJL, MW, PBO

JMc, AJL, MW, PBO