Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB315 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 315
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2021;
 April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 315 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchasing of the uniform of certain honorably
 retired or medically discharged peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter D, Chapter 614,
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. PURCHASE OF FIREARM OR UNIFORM OF HONORABLY RETIRED,
 MEDICALLY DISCHARGED, OR DECEASED PEACE OFFICER
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 614, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 614.055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 614.055.  PURCHASE OF UNIFORM ISSUED TO HONORABLY
 RETIRED AND CERTAIN MEDICALLY DISCHARGED STATE PEACE OFFICERS. (a)
 An individual may purchase a uniform from a state agency if:
 (1)  the individual was a peace officer commissioned by
 the agency;
 (2)  the individual was honorably retired or medically
 discharged under conditions other than dishonorable from the
 individual's commission by the agency; and
 (3)  the uniform had been previously issued to the
 individual by the agency.
 (b)  The nearest surviving relative of an individual
 described by Subsection (a) may purchase the individual's uniform
 from the state agency.
 (c)  A state agency shall establish the amount, which may not
 exceed fair market value, for which a uniform may be purchased under
 this section.
 (d)  An individual who purchases a uniform or on whose behalf
 a uniform is purchased under this section may be buried in the
 uniform.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *