Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3160 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/20/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 19, 2021       TO: Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB3160 by Martinez (Relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.), As Introduced     No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would amend Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code, to authorize the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to enter into a comprehensive development agreement (CDA) with a private entity to design, develop, finance, construct, maintain, repair, operate, extend, or expand a: (1) toll project; (2) state highway improvement project that includes both tolled and non-tolled lanes and may include non-tolled appurtenant facilities; (3) state highway improvement project in which the private entity has an interest in the project; (4) state highway improvement project financed wholly or partly with the proceeds of private activity bonds; or (5) non-tolled state highway improvement project authorized by the Legislature. The bill would amend Transportation Code 223.201 to extend the expiration date on TxDOT's authority to enter into a CDA from August 31, 2017, to August 31, 2031.  The bill would amend Transportation Code 370.305 to extend a regional mobility authority's authority to enter into a CDA from August 31, 2011, to August 31, 2031.Based on information provided by TxDOT, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with implementing a CDA authorized by the bill would be accommodated within existing resources and through the allocation of the agency's existing highway planning and construction funds.  Local Government ImpactNo significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.  Source Agencies: b > td > 601 Department of Transportation  LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AAL, MB, TG

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 19, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB3160 by Martinez (Relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3160 by Martinez (Relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.), As Introduced

 Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation

 Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB3160 by Martinez (Relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.), As Introduced 

 HB3160 by Martinez (Relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.), As Introduced 



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

The bill would amend Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code, to authorize the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to enter into a comprehensive development agreement (CDA) with a private entity to design, develop, finance, construct, maintain, repair, operate, extend, or expand a: (1) toll project; (2) state highway improvement project that includes both tolled and non-tolled lanes and may include non-tolled appurtenant facilities; (3) state highway improvement project in which the private entity has an interest in the project; (4) state highway improvement project financed wholly or partly with the proceeds of private activity bonds; or (5) non-tolled state highway improvement project authorized by the Legislature. The bill would amend Transportation Code 223.201 to extend the expiration date on TxDOT's authority to enter into a CDA from August 31, 2017, to August 31, 2031.  The bill would amend Transportation Code 370.305 to extend a regional mobility authority's authority to enter into a CDA from August 31, 2011, to August 31, 2031.Based on information provided by TxDOT, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with implementing a CDA authorized by the bill would be accommodated within existing resources and through the allocation of the agency's existing highway planning and construction funds.



Based on information provided by TxDOT, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with implementing a CDA authorized by the bill would be accommodated within existing resources and through the allocation of the agency's existing highway planning and construction funds.

 Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 601 Department of Transportation

601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AAL, MB, TG

JMc, AAL, MB, TG