Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3203 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3203
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3203 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the standard possession order and alternative
 possession times in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 153.317(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If elected by a conservator, the court shall alter the
 standard possession order under Sections 153.312, 153.314, and
 153.315 to provide for one or more of the following alternative
 beginning and ending possession times for the described periods of
 possession, unless the court finds that the election is not in the
 best interest of the child:
 (1)  for weekend periods of possession under Section
 153.312(a)(1) during the regular school term:
 (A)  beginning at the time the child's school is
 regularly dismissed;
 (B)  ending at the time the child's school resumes
 after the weekend; or
 (C)  beginning at the time described by Paragraph
 (A) and ending at the time described by Paragraph (B);
 (2)  for Thursday periods of possession under Section
 153.312(a)(2):
 (A)  beginning at the time the child's school is
 regularly dismissed;
 (B)  ending at the time the child's school resumes
 on Friday; or
 (C)  beginning at the time described by Paragraph
 (A) and ending at the time described by Paragraph (B);
 (3)  for spring vacation periods of possession under
 Section 153.312(b)(1), beginning at the time the child's school is
 dismissed for those vacations;
 (4)  for Christmas school vacation periods of
 possession under Section 153.314(1), beginning at the time the
 child's school is dismissed for the vacation;
 (5)  for Thanksgiving holiday periods of possession
 under Section 153.314(3), beginning at the time the child's school
 is dismissed for the holiday;
 (6)  for Father's Day periods of possession under
 Section 153.314(5), ending at 8 a.m. on the Monday after Father's
 Day weekend;
 (7)  for Mother's Day periods of possession under
 Section 153.314(6):
 (A)  beginning at the time the child's school is
 regularly dismissed on the Friday preceding Mother's Day;
 (B)  ending at the time the child's school resumes
 after Mother's Day; or
 (C)  beginning at the time described by Paragraph
 (A) and ending at the time described by Paragraph (B); [or]
 (8)  for weekend periods of possession that are
 extended under Section 153.315(b) by a student holiday or teacher
 in-service day that falls on a Friday, beginning at the time the
 child's school is regularly dismissed on Thursday; or
 (9)  for weekend periods of possession that are
 extended under Section 153.315(a) by a student holiday or teacher
 in-service day that falls on a Monday, ending at 8 a.m. Tuesday.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 153, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 153.3171 to read as follows:
 Sec. 153.3171.  BEGINNING AND ENDING POSSESSION TIMES FOR
 PARENTS WHO RESIDE 50 MILES OR LESS APART. (a)  Except as provided
 by Subsection (b), if the possessory conservator resides not more
 than 50 miles from the primary residence of the child, the court
 shall alter the standard possession order under Sections 153.312,
 153.314, and 153.315 to provide that the conservator has the right
 to possession of the child as if the conservator had made the
 elections for alternative beginning and ending possession times
 under Sections 153.317(a)(1)(C), (2)(C), (3), (4), (5), (6),
 (7)(C), and (8).
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply if:
 (1)  the possessory conservator declines one or more of
 the alternative beginning and ending possession times under
 Subsection (a) in a written document filed with the court or through
 an oral statement made in open court on the record;
 (2)  the court is denying, restricting, or limiting the
 possessory conservator's possession of or access to the child in
 the best interest of the child under Section 153.004; or
 (3)  the court finds that one or more of the alternative
 beginning and ending possession times under Subsection (a) are not
 in the best interest of the child, including:
 (A)  because the distances between residences
 make the possession schedule described by Subsection (a) unworkable
 or inappropriate considering the circumstances of the parties or
 the area in which the parties reside;
 (B)  because before the filing of the suit, the
 possessory conservator did not frequently and continuously
 exercise the rights and duties of a parent with respect to the
 child; or
 (C)  for any other reason the court considers
 relevant.
 (c)  On the request of a party, the court shall make findings
 of fact and conclusions of law regarding the order under this
 section.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 231, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 231.1211 to read as follows:
 Sec. 231.1211.  INFORMATIONAL MATERIALS ON STANDARD
 POSSESSION ORDER. (a) The Title IV-D agency shall create
 informational materials that describe the possession schedule
 under the standard possession order under Subchapter F, Chapter
 153, including any alternate schedules or elections available to
 conservators.
 (b)  The Title IV-D agency shall make the informational
 materials described by Subsection (a) available on the agency's
 Internet website and distribute printed copies of those materials
 on request.
 SECTION 4.  The enactment of this Act does not constitute a
 material and substantial change of circumstances sufficient to
 warrant modification of a court order or portion of a decree that
 provides for the possession of or access to a child rendered before
 the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 suit affecting the parent-child relationship that is pending in a
 trial court on the effective date of this Act or that is filed on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *