Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3257 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2021

                    87R5013 MWC-D
 By: King of Parker H.B. No. 3257


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Texas Commission on Antisemitism.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 448 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 448. TEXAS COMMISSION ON ANTISEMITISM
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL AND ADMINISTRATIVE PROVISIONS
 Sec. 448.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Antisemitism" means a certain perception of Jews
 that may be expressed as hatred toward Jews.  The term includes
 rhetorical and physical acts of antisemitism directed toward Jewish
 or non-Jewish individuals or their property or toward Jewish
 community institutions and religious facilities.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Antisemitism.
 Sec. 448.002.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Commission on
 Antisemitism is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the commission
 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2033.
 Sec. 448.003.  ADMINISTRATIVE ATTACHMENT. The commission is
 administratively attached to the Texas Historical Commission.
 SUBCHAPTER B. TEXAS COMMISSION ON ANTISEMITISM
 Sec. 448.051.  COMPOSITION OF COMMISSION. (a) The governor
 shall appoint nine members to the commission.
 (b)  A member of the commission must be a resident of this
 state.
 (c)  The commission must include members who have
 demonstrated a significant interest in and are knowledgeable about
 issues in the Jewish community and antisemitism.
 Sec. 448.052.  TERMS. (a) Commission members serve
 staggered six-year terms with the terms of three members expiring
 February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 (b)  A commission member is eligible for reappointment to
 another term or part of a term.
 (c)  A commission member may not serve more than two
 consecutive terms. For purposes of this subsection, a member is
 considered to have served a term only if the member served two or
 more years of the member's term.
 Sec. 448.053.  PRESIDING OFFICER. The governor shall
 designate a member of the commission as presiding officer of the
 commission to serve in that capacity at the pleasure of the
 governor.
 Sec. 448.054.  COMPENSATION; EXPENSES. A member of the
 commission is not entitled to compensation but is entitled to
 reimbursement for the travel expenses incurred by the member while
 transacting commission business, as provided by the General
 Appropriations Act.
 Sec. 448.055.  MEETINGS; QUORUM; PUBLIC ACCESS. (a) The
 commission shall meet at least quarterly at the times and places in
 this state the commission designates.
 (b)  Five voting members of the commission constitute a
 quorum for transacting commission business.
 (c)  The commission shall develop and implement policies
 that provide the public with a reasonable opportunity to appear
 before the commission and speak on any issue under the jurisdiction
 of the commission.
 Sec. 448.056.  COORDINATOR; STAFF. (a) The Texas
 Historical Commission shall provide one part-time employee to serve
 as the coordinator for the commission to transact commission
 business.
 (b)  The Texas Historical Commission may provide staff and
 may support functions and activities of the commission from money
 available to the Texas Historical Commission that may be used for
 this purpose. The legislature may also specifically appropriate
 money to the Texas Historical Commission to provide staff and to
 otherwise support functions and activities of the commission.
 SUBCHAPTER C. DUTIES AND FUNDING
 Sec. 448.101.  ADVISORY STATUS OF COMMISSION. (a) In
 implementing its powers and duties under this chapter, the
 commission functions only in an advisory capacity. Membership on
 the commission does not constitute a public office.
 (b)  Chapter 2110 does not apply to the commission.
 Sec. 448.102.  DUTIES OF COMMISSION. (a) The commission
 shall:
 (1)  conduct a study on antisemitism in this state and
 submit a report on the results of the study to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and each member of the legislature not later than November 1 of each
 even-numbered year;
 (2)  provide advice and assistance to public and
 private primary and secondary schools and institutions of higher
 education in this state regarding methods of combating
 antisemitism;
 (3)  meet with appropriate representatives of public
 and private organizations, including service organizations, to
 provide information on and to assist in planning, coordinating, or
 modifying antisemitism awareness programs; and
 (4)  solicit volunteers to participate in
 commemorative events designed to enhance public awareness of the
 fight against antisemitism.
 (b)  The commission shall adopt rules as necessary for its
 own procedures.
 Sec. 448.103.  FUNDING; AFFILIATED NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION.
 (a) The commission may accept gifts, grants, and donations from a
 public or private source for the commission to use in performing the
 commission's duties under this chapter.
 (b)  The commission may participate in the establishment and
 operation of an affiliated nonprofit organization whose purpose is
 to raise funds for or provide services or other benefits to the
 commission.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governor shall appoint members to the Texas
 Commission on Antisemitism as provided by Chapter 448, Government
 Code, as added by this Act. To implement the staggering of terms of
 members of the commission provided by Section 448.052, Government
 Code, as added by this Act, in making the first appointments to the
 commission, the governor shall provide for three of the members to
 serve terms expiring February 1, 2023, three of the members to serve
 terms expiring February 1, 2025, and three of the members to serve
 terms expiring February 1, 2027. Subsequent appointments shall be
 for six-year terms, as provided by Section 448.052, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.