Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3287 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: González of El Paso, et al. H.B. No. 3287
 (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3287 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of certain co-navigation services to
 persons who are deaf-blind.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 81.001, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (1) to read as follows:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 81, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Section 81.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.014.  CO-NAVIGATION SERVICES PROGRAM FOR PERSONS WHO
 ARE DEAF-BLIND. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Communication mode" includes communication
 through:
 (A)  auditory amplification, such as through a
 personal hearing aid or assistive listening device;
 (B)  American Sign Language or Signed English by
 both tactile and visual means; and
 (C)  protactile language.
 (2)  "Co-navigation services" means services provided
 to a person who is deaf-blind that assist the person to physically
 access the person's environment and to make informed decisions. The
 term includes providing visual and environmental information or
 sighted guide services and assisting with communication
 accessibility by communicating in the preferred language and
 communication mode of the person who is deaf-blind. The term does
 not include performing any of the following for the person:
 (A)  providing personal care services to the
 person;
 (B)  completing ordinary errands for the person;
 (C)  making decisions for the person;
 (D)  teaching or otherwise instructing the
 person; or
 (E)  interpreting for the person in a formal
 setting, including a medical, legal, or business setting.
 (3)  "Co-navigator" means a person who is specially
 trained to provide co-navigation services.
 (4)  "Program" means the deaf-blind co-navigation
 services program.
 (5)  "Protactile language" means a method of
 communication based on touch that is used by persons who are
 deaf-blind.
 (b)  The commission shall operate a statewide co-navigation
 services program through which:
 (1)  co-navigation services are provided by
 co-navigators; and
 (2)  the commission reimburses the co-navigators for
 the provision of the services.
 (c)  The executive commissioner by rule shall establish
 reimbursement rates to be paid to a co-navigator under the program.
 The reimbursement rates must use a tiered wage scale that is based
 on the co-navigator's:
 (1)  level of training in communication modes for
 persons who are deaf-blind and in sighted guide-mobility
 techniques; and
 (2)  fluency and skill in communication modes and
 sighted guide-mobility for persons who are deaf-blind.
 (d)  The commission shall ensure that quality co-navigation
 services are provided under the program by:
 (1)  monitoring the compliance of co-navigators with
 program rules;
 (2)  developing funding sources for the program that
 are in addition to state sources and will reduce reliance on the
 state sources for continuation of the program; and
 (3)  providing funding and technical assistance for
 training programs for:
 (A)  co-navigators under the program; and
 (B)  persons who are deaf-blind to enable those
 persons to effectively use the services offered under the program.
 (e)  The executive commissioner may establish an advisory
 committee to advise the commission in developing and operating the
 program, including operating the program in a manner that ensures
 the efficient use of state money. Subject to Section 2110.002,
 Government Code, the executive commissioner shall determine the
 number of members serving on the advisory committee, which must
 include persons who are deaf-blind and other stakeholders.
 (f)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary
 to:
 (1)  operate the program in a manner that is efficient
 and maximizes the number of persons served; and
 (2)  ensure that co-navigators receiving reimbursement
 under the program have adequate training to provide co-navigation
 services.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than September 1, 2022:
 (1)  the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 81.014, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  the commission shall begin operating the program
 required by that section.
 SECTION 4.  The Health and Human Services Commission is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations that are available
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *