Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3319 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Meyer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3319
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain measures to promote compliance with and improve
 public awareness of the state's move over or slow down law
 concerning the passing of certain vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1001.1101 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.1101.  INFORMATION RELATING TO PASSING CERTAIN
 VEHICLES. (a) The commission by rule shall require that
 information relating to the requirements of Section 545.157,
 Transportation Code, concerning the passing of certain vehicles be
 included in the curriculum of each driver education course or
 driving safety course.
 (b)  In developing rules under this section, the commission
 shall consult with the Department of Public Safety.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.623 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.623.  MOVE OVER OR SLOW DOWN CAMPAIGN. (a) The
 department shall develop and implement a move over or slow down
 public awareness campaign designed to promote compliance with and
 improve public awareness of the requirements of Section 545.157
 concerning the passing of certain vehicles.
 (b)  The department may consult and coordinate with the
 Department of Public Safety and the Texas Department of Motor
 Vehicles as the department considers necessary to develop or
 implement the campaign.
 (c)  In implementing the campaign, the department may engage
 in online advocacy, issue public service announcements, distribute
 materials, and post signage on roadways relating to the campaign.
 (d)  The department may pay the costs of the campaign and its
 administration from:
 (1)  gifts, grants, or donations;
 (2)  matching funds; and
 (3)  other funds made available for that purpose,
 including available department revenue.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Not later than May 1, 2022, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules
 required by Section 1001.1101, Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 (b)  Each driver education or driving safety course held on
 or after September 1, 2022, shall include in the course's
 curriculum the information required by the rules adopted under
 Section 1001.1101, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *