Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB332 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Talarico, Bernal, Buckley H.B. No. 332
 (Senate Sponsor - Lucio, West)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 3; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of the compensatory education allotment for
 programs that build certain social and emotional skills.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 48.104(j-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (j-1)  In addition to other purposes for which funds
 allocated under this section may be used, those funds may also be
 used to:
 (1)  provide child-care services or assistance with
 child-care expenses for students at risk of dropping out of school
 under[, as described by] Section 29.081(d) because the students are
 parents [29.081(d)(5)]; [or]
 (2)  pay the costs associated with services provided
 through a life skills program in accordance with Sections
 29.085(b)(1) and (3)-(7); or
 (3)  provide programs that build skills related to
 managing emotions, establishing and maintaining positive
 relationships, and making responsible decisions.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *