Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3333 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2021

                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3333
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to limitations periods in arbitration proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 16, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 16.073 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 16.073.  APPLICABILITY OF LIMITATIONS PERIODS TO
 ARBITRATION. (a) A party may not assert a claim in an arbitration
 proceeding if the party could not bring suit for the claim in court
 due to the expiration of the applicable limitations period.
 (b)  A party may assert a claim in an arbitration proceeding
 after expiration of the applicable limitations period if:
 (1)  the party brought suit for the claim in court
 before the expiration of the applicable limitations period; and
 (2)  the parties to the claim agreed to arbitrate the
 claim or a court ordered the parties to arbitrate the claim.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *