Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3348 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Pacheco, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 3348
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the number of baccalaureate degree programs certain
 public junior colleges may offer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.306(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A public junior college offering a baccalaureate degree
 program under this subchapter [Section 130.303(a)] may not offer
 more than five baccalaureate degree programs at any time.
 SECTION 2.  Section 130.306(b), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *