Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3379 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Leman, et al. H.B. No. 3379
 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst, et al.)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3379 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duty to report child abuse and neglect.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 261.101(a), (b), and (b-1), Family
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person having reasonable cause to believe that a
 child's physical or mental health or welfare has been adversely
 affected by abuse or neglect by any person shall immediately make a
 report as provided by this subchapter.
 (b)  If a professional has reasonable cause to believe that a
 child has been abused or neglected or may be abused or neglected, or
 that a child is a victim of an offense under Section 21.11, Penal
 Code, and the professional has reasonable cause to believe that the
 child has been abused as defined by Section 261.001, the
 professional shall make a report not later than the 48th hour after
 the hour the professional first has reasonable cause to believe
 [suspects] that the child has been or may be abused or neglected or
 is a victim of an offense under Section 21.11, Penal Code. A
 professional may not delegate to or rely on another person to make
 the report. In this subsection, "professional" means an individual
 who is licensed or certified by the state or who is an employee of a
 facility licensed, certified, or operated by the state and who, in
 the normal course of official duties or duties for which a license
 or certification is required, has direct contact with children.
 The term includes teachers, nurses, doctors, day-care employees,
 employees of a clinic or health care facility that provides
 reproductive services, juvenile probation officers, and juvenile
 detention or correctional officers.
 (b-1)  In addition to the duty to make a report under
 Subsection (a) or (b), a person or professional shall make a report
 in the manner required by Subsection (a) or (b), as applicable, if
 the person or professional has reasonable cause to believe that an
 adult was a victim of abuse or neglect as a child and the person or
 professional determines in good faith that disclosure of the
 information is necessary to protect the health and safety of:
 (1)  another child; or
 (2)  an elderly person or person with a disability as
 defined by Section 48.002, Human Resources Code.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a report of suspected abuse or neglect of a child that is made on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A report of suspected abuse
 or neglect that is made before that date is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the report was made, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *