Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3390 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/05/2021

                    By: Thompson of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 3390
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 5, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 5, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase of cybersecurity insurance coverage by the
 Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.712 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.712.  PURCHASE OF CYBERSECURITY INSURANCE. (a) In
 this section, "cyber attack" means an attempt to gain illegal
 access to a computer or computer system for the purpose of causing
 damage, harm, or disruption.
 (b)  The department may purchase insurance coverage that the
 department considers necessary to protect against liability,
 revenue, and property losses that may result from a data breach or
 cyber attack.
 (c)  Insurance purchased under this section may include
 coverage for business and dependent business interruption loss,
 breach response, data recovery, cyber extortion or ransomware
 response, fiduciary liability, media liability, professional
 liability, or expenses for general incident management, such as
 investigation, remediation, and notification.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *