Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3473 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2021

                    87R12161 CXP-D
 By: Hinojosa H.B. No. 3473


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Public Utility Commission of
 Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.051, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The commission is composed of five [three]
 commissioners appointed by the governor.
 (a-1)  The chair of the legislative caucus whose political
 party has the most members in the house of representatives shall
 submit to the governor a list of names of at least five persons
 eligible for appointment as commissioner. The governor shall
 appoint three commissioners from the list.
 (a-2)  The chair of the legislative caucus whose political
 party has the second most members in the house of representatives
 shall submit to the governor a list of names of at least five
 persons eligible for appointment as commissioner. The governor
 shall appoint two commissioners from the list [with the advice and
 consent of the senate].
 SECTION 2.  The governor shall promptly appoint five
 commissioners to the Public Utility Commission of Texas in
 accordance with Section 12.051, Utilities Code, as amended by this
 Act. Notwithstanding Section 12.051(c), Utilities Code, in making
 the initial appointments under that section, the governor shall
 designate one commissioner to a term expiring September 1, 2023,
 two commissioners to a term expiring September 1, 2025, and two
 commissioners to a term expiring September 1, 2027. A person who
 is serving as a commissioner of the Public Utility Commission of
 Texas immediately before the effective date of this Act may
 continue to serve until the person's successor is appointed and
 qualifies to serve.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.