Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3516 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: King of Uvalde, Guillen H.B. No. 3516
 (Senate Sponsor - Perry)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 10, 2021, rereferred to
 Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of the recycling of fluid oil and gas
 waste.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 122.004, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 122.004.  COMMISSION RULES FOR TREATMENT AND BENEFICIAL
 USE.  (a) The commission shall adopt rules to govern the treatment
 and beneficial use of oil and gas waste.
 (b)  Rules adopted under this section must:
 (1)  encourage fluid oil and gas waste recycling for
 beneficial purposes; and
 (2)  establish standards for the issuance of permits
 for commercial recycling of fluid oil and gas waste.
 (c)  In adopting rules under this section, the commission
 shall consider previously adopted rules for recycling fluid oil and
 gas waste.
 (d)  Rules adopted under this section for commercial
 recycling of fluid oil and gas waste must establish:
 (1)  minimum siting standards for fluid recycling pits;
 (2)  uniform technical, construction, and placement
 standards;
 (3)  uniform standards for estimating closure costs;
 (4)  minimum and maximum bonding and financial security
 amounts based on factors determined by the commission; and
 (5)  standards for sampling and analysis of fluid oil
 and gas waste.
 (e)  The commission shall approve or deny an application for
 a permit issued under rules adopted under this section not later
 than the 90th day after the date the complete application was
 received by the commission, unless a protest is filed with the
 commission, in which case the commission may extend the amount of
 time to approve or deny the application in order to allow for
 notice, public comment, and a public hearing on the application. If
 the commission does not approve or deny the application before that
 date, the permit application is considered approved and the
 applicant may operate under the terms specified in the application
 for a period of one year.
 (f)  An application requesting a variance from the standards
 adopted under this section must be evaluated and determined to be
 substantially similar to previous variances approved by the
 commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *