Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3571 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Bonnen, Dean, Thompson of Brazoria H.B. No. 3571
 (Senate Sponsor - Springer)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3571 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of security measures by certain property
 owners' associations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 202, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 202.023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 202.023.  SECURITY MEASURES. (a) This section does not
 apply to a master mixed-use property owners' association subject to
 Chapter 215.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a property owners'
 association may not adopt or enforce a restrictive covenant that
 prevents a property owner from building or installing security
 measures, including but not limited to a security camera, motion
 detector, or perimeter fence.
 (c)  This section does not prohibit a property owners'
 association from regulating the type of fencing that a property
 owner may install.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *