Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3644 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3644
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 10, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a memorial monument dedicated to
 emergency medical services personnel on the Capitol grounds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 443, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 443.01527 to read as follows:
 Sec. 443.01527.  MEMORIAL MONUMENT FOR EMERGENCY MEDICAL
 SERVICES PERSONNEL.  The State Preservation Board may approve and
 establish an appropriate memorial monument on the State Capitol
 grounds dedicated to emergency medical services personnel, as
 defined by Section 773.003, Health and Safety Code, in this state.
 The State Preservation Board may only use private contributions
 made for a purpose related to the memorial monument to create,
 establish, and perpetually maintain the monument.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *