Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3684 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2021

                    87R8942 SMT-D
 By: Bonnen H.B. No. 3684


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of the windstorm insurance legislative
 funding and funding structure oversight board and to studies
 relating to the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and the Fair
 Access to Insurance Requirements Plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2210.664(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than November 15, 2022 [2020], the board shall
 deliver a [the] report prepared under Subsection (a) to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2210.665, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.665.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 3.  Sections 14(c) and (d), Chapter 790 (H.B. 1900),
 Acts of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, are amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2023 [2021], the windstorm
 insurance legislative oversight board shall submit to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the Texas Department of Insurance a written
 report of a [the] study conducted under this section. The report
 must include the findings and legislative recommendations of the
 board.
 (d)  This section expires January 1, 2024 [2022].
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.