Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3689 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Gutierrez) H.B. No. 3689
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appeal of rates charged for water or sewer service
 by certain retail public utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.043(j), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (j)  In an appeal under this section, the utility commission
 shall ensure that every appealed rate is [made, demanded, or
 received by any retail public utility or by any two or more retail
 public utilities jointly shall be] just and reasonable.  Rates
 shall not be unreasonably preferential, prejudicial, or
 discriminatory but shall be sufficient, equitable, and consistent
 in application to each class of customers.  The utility commission
 shall use a methodology that preserves the financial integrity of
 the retail public utility.  For agreements between municipalities
 the utility commission shall consider the terms of any wholesale
 water or sewer service agreement in an appellate rate proceeding.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *