Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3702 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Paddie, Meyer, Tinderholt H.B. No. 3702
 (Senate Sponsor - Springer)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting the enactment of a law that imposes a tax on
 certain transactions that either convey a security or involve
 specified derivative contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 101, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Section 101.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 101.010.  PROVISIONS RELATING TO SECURITIES MARKET
 OPERATORS. (a) After January 1, 2022, no law may be enacted that
 imposes an occupation tax on a registered securities market
 operator or a tax on a securities transaction of a registered
 securities market operator.
 (b)  The term "registered securities market operator" means
 a self-regulatory organization, national securities exchange,
 financial institution, alternative trading system, trade reporting
 facility, broker, dealer, clearing agency, or transfer agent, as
 those terms are defined in the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (15
 U.S.C. 78a et seq.) or a board of trade, commodities pool operator,
 derivatives clearing organization, electronic trading facility, or
 organized exchange, as that term is defined in the Commodity
 Exchange Act (7 U.S.C. Section 1 et seq.), or an affiliate,
 subsidiary, or facility thereof, to the extent that such regulated
 securities market operator is subject to registration with and
 regulation by the U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission or the
 U.S. Commodities Futures Trading Commission.
 (c)  The term "security" or "securities" means the
 definition of that term set forth in the Securities Exchange Act of
 1934 (15 U.S.C. Section 78c(a)(10)).
 (d)  The term "securities transaction" means the purchase or
 sale of securities by a registered securities market operator on
 behalf of a customer, any contract or agreement to do the same, and
 any service by a registered securities market operator to
 facilitate, match parties to, process, report, clear, or settle the
 purchase or sale of securities on behalf of a customer.
 (e)  This section does not prohibit:
 (1)  the imposition of a general business tax measured
 by business activity;
 (2)  the imposition of a tax on the production of
 minerals;
 (3)  the imposition of a tax on insurance premiums;
 (4)  the imposition of a general sales tax on tangible
 personal property or services;
 (5)  the imposition of a fee based on the cost of
 processing documents; or
 (6)  the change of a rate of a tax in existence on
 January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021, to authorize the legislature to prohibit the
 enactment of a law that imposes a tax on certain transactions that
 either convey a security or involve specified derivative contracts
 is approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *