Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3807 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Hunter, Herrero, Morales of Harris H.B. No. 3807
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 20, 2021, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3807 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of lifeguards and informational signs to
 improve safety on public beaches.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Je'Sani Smith Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.065, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  As part of the duty under this section to clean and
 maintain the condition of public beaches, a municipality shall:
 (1)  during reasonable daylight hours, as established
 and posted by the municipality, from Memorial Day to Labor Day,
 provide:
 (A)  occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within the
 corporate boundaries; or
 (B)  a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within the
 corporate boundaries if the single tower provides an unobstructed
 view of both sides of the structure; and
 (2)  post within 100 yards of each side of each
 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
 (d)  A municipality may suspend or alter the duties imposed
 under Subsection (c) during dangerous weather conditions or
 emergency operations.
 SECTION 3.  Section 61.066, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.066.  DUTY OF COUNTY. (a) It is the duty and
 responsibility of the commissioners court of any county located or
 bordering on the Gulf of Mexico to clean and maintain the condition
 of all public beaches located inside the county but outside the
 boundaries of any incorporated city located or bordering on the
 Gulf of Mexico and all public beaches owned by the county and
 located inside the boundaries of an incorporated city, town, or
 village.
 (b)  As part of the duty under this section to clean and
 maintain the condition of public beaches, a county shall:
 (1)  during reasonable daylight hours, as established
 and posted by the county, from Memorial Day to Labor Day, provide:
 (A)  occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located on a public
 beach described by Subsection (a); or
 (B)  a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located on a public beach
 described by Subsection (a) if the single tower provides an
 unobstructed view of both sides of the structure; and
 (2)  post within 100 yards of each side of each
 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
 (c)  A county may suspend or alter the duties imposed under
 Subsection (b) during dangerous weather conditions or emergency
 operations.
 SECTION 4.  Section 61.067, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-2) and (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  As part of the duty under this section to clean and
 maintain the condition of public beaches located within state
 parks, the department shall:
 (1)  during reasonable daylight hours, as established
 and posted by the department, from Memorial Day to Labor Day,
 provide:
 (A)  occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a
 state park; or
 (B)  a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a state
 park if the single tower provides an unobstructed view of both sides
 of the structure; and
 (2)  post within 100 yards of each side of each
 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
 (a-3)  The department may suspend or alter the duties imposed
 under Subsection (a-2) during dangerous weather conditions or
 emergency operations.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter A, Chapter 13, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 13.023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.023.  LIFEGUARDS AND SIGNAGE IN CERTAIN AREAS. (a)
 The department shall:
 (1)  during reasonable daylight hours, as established
 and posted by the department, from Memorial Day to Labor Day,
 provide:
 (A)  occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a
 state park; or
 (B)  a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a state
 park if the single tower provides an unobstructed view of both sides
 of each structure; and
 (2)  post within 100 yards of each side of each
 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
 (b)  The department may suspend or alter the duties imposed
 under Subsection (a) during dangerous weather conditions or
 emergency operations.
 SECTION 6.  The Parks and Wildlife Department is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, that agency may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *