Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3821 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3821
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3821 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to employing and training mental health professionals for
 the mental health program for veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 434.352(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission and the Health and Human [Department of
 State Health] Services Commission shall coordinate to administer
 the mental health program for veterans developed under Chapter
 1001, Health and Safety Code.
 (b)  For the mental health program for veterans, the
 commission shall:
 (1)  provide training to peer service coordinators and
 peers in accordance with Section 434.353;
 (2)  provide technical assistance to peer service
 coordinators and peers;
 (3)  identify, train, and communicate with
 community-based licensed mental health professionals,
 community-based organizations, and faith-based organizations;
 (4)  coordinate services for justice involved
 veterans; [and]
 (5)  coordinate local delivery to veterans and
 immediate family members of veterans of mental health first aid for
 veterans training; and
 (6)  employ and train mental health professionals to
 assist the Health and Human Services Commission in the
 administration of the program.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *