Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3856 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2021

                    By: Rogers (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 3856
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture, & Rural Affairs; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to administrative penalties imposed by the Texas Animal
 Health Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 161.148(a) and (b), Agriculture Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may impose an administrative penalty on
 [against] a person who violates this subtitle or a rule or order
 adopted under this subtitle.
 (b)  The penalty for a violation may be in an amount not to
 exceed $5,000 [$1,000]. Each day a violation continues or occurs is
 a separate violation for purposes of imposing a penalty. The amount
 of the penalty shall not be based on a per head basis.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a violation committed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 violation committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the violation was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, a violation was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the violation occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *