Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3924 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Oliverson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 3924
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 3; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to health benefits offered by certain nonprofit
 agricultural organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subtitle K, Title 8, Insurance
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBTITLE K. CERTAIN BENEFITS AND ARRANGEMENTS THAT ARE NOT
 INSURANCE [HEALTH CARE SHARING MINISTRIES]
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle K, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1682 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1682. HEALTH BENEFITS PROVIDED BY CERTAIN NONPROFIT
 AGRICULTURAL ORGANIZATIONS
 Sec. 1682.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Nonprofit agricultural organization" means an
 organization that:
 (A)  is exempt from taxation under Section 501(a),
 Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as an organization described by
 Section 501(c)(5) of that code;
 (B)  is domiciled in this state;
 (C)  was in existence prior to 1940;
 (D)  is composed of members who are residents of
 at least 98 percent of the counties in this state;
 (E)  collects annual dues from its members; and
 (F)  was created to promote and develop the most
 profitable and desirable system of agriculture and the most
 wholesome and satisfactory conditions of rural life in accordance
 with its articles of organization and bylaws.
 (2)  "Nonprofit agricultural organization health
 benefits" means health benefits:
 (A)  sponsored by a nonprofit agricultural
 organization or an affiliate of the organization;
 (B)  offered only to:
 (i)  members of the nonprofit agricultural
 organization; and
 (ii)  family members of members of the
 nonprofit agricultural organization;
 (C)  that are not provided through an insurance
 policy or other product the offering or issuance of which
 constitutes the business of insurance in this state; and
 (D)  that are deemed by the nonprofit agricultural
 organization to be important in assisting its members to live long
 and productive lives.
 (3)  "Preexisting condition" means a condition present
 before the effective date of an individual's enrollment in
 nonprofit agricultural organization health benefits.
 Sec. 1682.002.  NONPROFIT AGRICULTURAL ORGANIZATION HEALTH
 BENEFITS AUTHORIZED. A nonprofit agricultural organization or an
 affiliate of the organization may offer in this state nonprofit
 agricultural organization health benefits.
 Sec. 1682.003.  WAITING PERIOD FOR PREEXISTING CONDITION.
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, a nonprofit
 agricultural organization that offers nonprofit agricultural
 organization health benefits may not require a waiting period of
 more than six months for treatment of a preexisting condition
 otherwise included in nonprofit agricultural organization health
 benefits.
 Sec. 1682.004.  REQUIRED DISCLOSURE BY NONPROFIT
 AGRICULTURAL ORGANIZATION. (a) A nonprofit agricultural
 organization that offers nonprofit agricultural organization
 health benefits must provide to an individual applying for
 nonprofit agricultural organization health benefits written notice
 that the benefits are not provided through an insurance policy or
 other product the offering or issuance of which is regulated as the
 business of insurance in this state.
 (b)  An individual must sign and return to the nonprofit
 agricultural organization the notice described by Subsection (a)
 before the individual may enroll in nonprofit agricultural
 organization health benefits. The nonprofit agricultural
 organization must:
 (1)  maintain a copy of the signed written notice for
 the duration of the term during which the nonprofit agricultural
 organization health benefits are provided to the individual; and
 (2)  at the request of the individual, provide a copy of
 the written notice to the individual.
 Sec. 1682.005.  NONPROFIT AGRICULTURAL ORGANIZATION NOT
 ENGAGED IN BUSINESS OF INSURANCE. Notwithstanding any other
 provision of this code, for the purposes of offering nonprofit
 agricultural organization health benefits, a nonprofit
 agricultural organization that acts in accordance with this chapter
 is not an insurer and is not engaging in the business of insurance
 in this state.
 Sec. 1682.006.  RISK TRANSFER OR COVERAGE. A nonprofit
 agricultural organization that offers nonprofit agricultural
 organization health benefits under this chapter may contract with a
 company authorized to engage in the business of insurance in this
 state that is not under common control with the nonprofit
 agricultural organization to:
 (1)  transfer to that company all or a portion of the
 organization's risks arising from nonprofit agricultural
 organization health benefits offered under this chapter; or
 (2)  obtain insurance coverage from the company
 guarantying the nonprofit agricultural organization's obligations
 arising from nonprofit agricultural organization health benefits
 offered under this chapter.
 Sec. 1682.007.  APPLICABILITY OF CERTAIN LAWS TO NONPROFIT
 AGRICULTURAL ORGANIZATION HEALTH BENEFITS. Notwithstanding
 Section 1682.004, a nonprofit agricultural organization that
 offers nonprofit agricultural organization health benefits that
 are determined by the commissioner to be structured in the manner of
 a preferred provider benefit plan or an exclusive provider benefit
 plan, as those terms are defined by Section 1301.001, is subject to
 the following laws and rules as if the nonprofit agricultural
 organization were an insurer, individuals entitled to nonprofit
 agricultural organization health benefits were insureds, and the
 nonprofit agricultural organization health benefits were provided
 through an insurance policy subject to Chapter 1301:
 (1)  Section 1301.005;
 (2)  Section 1301.0053;
 (3)  Section 1301.0055;
 (4)  Section 1301.006;
 (5)  Section 1301.010;
 (6)  Section 1301.155;
 (7)  Section 1301.164;
 (8)  Section 1301.165;
 (9)  Chapter 1467; and
 (10)  28 T.A.C. Chapter 3, Subchapter X.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *