Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3938 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/11/2021

                    87R5342 KJE-D
 By: Bell of Kaufman H.B. No. 3938


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the industry-based certification
 advisory council and the transfer of certain duties to that
 advisory council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 312 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 312. INDUSTRY-BASED CERTIFICATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
 Sec. 312.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "advisory
 council" means the industry-based certification advisory council
 established under this chapter.
 Sec. 312.002.  ADVISORY COUNCIL. (a) The industry-based
 certification advisory council is established to advise the
 commission regarding the alignment of public high school career and
 technology education programs with current and future workforce
 needs in communities, regions, and the state.
 (b)  The advisory council is composed of the following nine
 members:
 (1)  three members representing industry in this state,
 one each appointed by the governor, the lieutenant governor, and
 the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (2)  three members representing public school teachers
 who teach career and technology education courses or public school
 administrators, one each appointed by the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives; and
 (3)  three members representing a public junior college
 as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, one each appointed by
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house
 of representatives.
 (c)  The members of the advisory council serve staggered
 four-year terms, with the terms of either four or five members
 expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 (c-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), the initial members
 appointed shall determine by lot which four of the nine initial
 members will serve terms that expire February 1, 2023, and which
 five of the nine initial members will serve terms that expire
 February 1, 2025. This subsection expires January 1, 2026.
 (d)  A vacancy on the advisory council shall be filled in the
 same manner as the original appointment for that position.
 (e)  A member of the advisory council is not entitled to
 compensation for service as a member of the advisory council but is
 entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary travel expenses
 incurred in performing functions as a member of the advisory
 council, as provided in the General Appropriations Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 29.189, Education Code, is transferred
 to Chapter 312, Labor Code, as added by this Act, redesignated as
 Section 312.003, Labor Code, and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 312.003.  [Sec. 29.189.] INVENTORY OF CREDENTIALS AND
 CERTIFICATES. (a) The advisory council [In this section:
 [(1)  "Commission" means the Texas Workforce
 Commission.
 [(2)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 [(b)  The agency, the coordinating board, and the
 commission] shall [jointly] develop [and post on their respective
 Internet websites] an inventory of industry-recognized credentials
 and certificates that may be earned by a public high school student
 through a career and technology education program and that:
 (1)  are aligned to state and regional workforce needs;
 and
 (2)  serve as an entry point to middle- and high-wage
 jobs.
 (b) [(c)]  The inventory must include for each credential or
 certificate:
 (1)  the associated career cluster;
 (2)  the awarding entity;
 (3)  the level of education required and any additional
 requirements for the credential or certificate;
 (4)  any fees for obtaining the credential or
 certificate; and
 (5)  the average wage or salary for jobs that require or
 prefer the credential or certificate.
 (c)  In developing the inventory, the advisory council may
 consult with local workforce boards, the Texas Workforce Investment
 Council, the Texas Economic Development and Tourism Office, and the
 Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
 (d)  The advisory council shall establish a process for
 developing the inventory, including the criteria for the inclusion
 of a credential or certificate in the inventory.
 (e)  The advisory council shall annually review and revise
 the inventory.
 (f)  Each year, [the agency, the coordinating board, and] the
 commission [jointly] shall:
 (1)  adopt [review] and, if necessary, review [update]
 the inventory; and
 (2)  provide a copy of the inventory to the Texas
 Education Agency and to each school district and public institution
 of higher education that offers a career and technology education
 program to public high school students.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act but not later than September 1, 2021, the industry-based
 certification advisory council established under Chapter 312,
 Labor Code, as added by this Act, shall develop the initial
 inventory required under that chapter.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.