Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3961 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                    By: Spiller, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3961
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3961 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to required posting of information regarding the office of
 the state long-term care ombudsman on certain long-term care
 facilities' Internet websites.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 260C to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 260C. POSTING OF OFFICE OF STATE LONG-TERM CARE OMBUDSMAN
 INFORMATION BY CERTAIN FACILITIES
 Sec. 260C.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "long-term
 care facility" means:
 (1)  a nursing facility licensed under Chapter 242;
 (2)  an assisted living facility licensed under Chapter
 247; or
 (3)  any other facility providing care to residents who
 are assisted by the state long-term care ombudsman established
 under Subchapter F, Chapter 101A, Human Resources Code.
 Sec. 260C.002.  POSTING OF OFFICE OF STATE LONG-TERM CARE
 OMBUDSMAN INFORMATION ON INTERNET WEBSITE.  (a)  Except as provided
 by Subsection (b), a long-term care facility shall post on the
 facility's Internet website information about the office of the
 state long-term care ombudsman established under Subchapter F,
 Chapter 101A, Human Resources Code, including:
 (1)  information regarding the office's role as an
 advocate for residents of long-term care facilities; and
 (2)  the office's statewide toll-free telephone number.
 (b)  A long-term care facility:
 (1)  may comply with this section by posting the
 required information on the Internet website of the facility's
 parent company if the facility does not maintain a unique Internet
 website; and
 (2)  is not required to comply with this section if the
 facility and any parent company do not maintain an Internet
 website.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *