Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3971 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Meyer (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3971
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of
 residential real property located in a designated historic
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.013, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  In this subsection, "designated historic district"
 means an area that is zoned or otherwise designated as a historic
 district under municipal, state, or federal law.  In determining
 the market value of residential real property located in a
 designated historic district, the chief appraiser shall consider
 the effect on the property's value of any restriction placed by the
 historic district on the property owner's ability to alter,
 improve, or repair the property.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies to the appraisal for ad valorem
 tax purposes of residential real property only for a tax year
 beginning on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *