Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB402 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 402
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2021;
 April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain funds derived from criminal asset
 forfeiture to provide services to domestic victims of trafficking.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 59.06, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (u) to read as follows:
 (u)  As a specific exception to Subsection (c) that the funds
 described by that subsection be used only for the official purposes
 of the attorney representing the state or for law enforcement
 purposes, to cover the costs of a contract with a municipal or
 county program to provide services to domestic victims of
 trafficking, the attorney representing the state or the head of a
 law enforcement agency, as applicable, may use any portion of the
 gross amount credited to the attorney's or agency's special fund
 under Subsection (c) from the forfeiture of contraband that:
 (1)  is used in the commission of, or used to facilitate
 or intended to be used to facilitate the commission of, an offense
 under Chapter 20A, Penal Code; or
 (2)  consists of proceeds gained from the commission
 of, or property acquired with proceeds gained from the commission
 of, an offense under Chapter 20A, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act in amending
 Article 59.06, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies to the
 disposition or use, on or after the effective date of this Act, of
 proceeds or property received by a law enforcement agency or
 attorney representing the state under Chapter 59, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, regardless of whether the receipt of the proceeds or
 property occurred before, on, or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *