Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4068 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 4068
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain public retirement systems
 for police and fire fighters to participate in the Texas Municipal
 Retirement System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 852.005, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (b) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  For the purposes of this subtitle, the Texas Municipal
 Retirement System, the pension system provided under Article
 6243a-1, Revised Statutes, and [, as limited by Subsection (b),]
 the Texas Municipal League, have the standing of municipalities.
 (b)  The standing of the pension system provided under
 Article 6243a-1, Revised Statutes, as a municipality under
 Subsection (a) applies only with respect to the system and the
 system's employees. Subsection (a) does not require or authorize:
 (1)  a person who is a member, pensioner, alternate
 payee, or other beneficiary of the pension system provided under
 Article 6243a-1, Revised Statutes, to participate in the Texas
 Municipal Retirement System; and
 (2)  the consolidation of both public retirement
 systems or the transfer of a fund or any plan created or maintained
 under former Article 6243a, Revised Statutes, or Article 6243a-1,
 Revised Statutes, to the Texas Municipal Retirement System.
 SECTION 2.  Section 852.005, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only with respect to a person who is an employee
 of the pension system provided under Article 6243a-1, Revised
 Statutes, on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *