Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4149 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 4149
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county jailers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.310, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The commission and the Commission on Jail Standards may
 develop additional training for county jailers serving under
 permanent appointments to promote health and safety in county
 jails.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *