Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4153 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Sanford (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 4153
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0, one present not voting; May 20, 2021, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the filing of an annual audit report by a title
 insurance company, title insurance agent, or direct operation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2651.151(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than the 90th day after the date of the end of
 the agent's or direct operation's fiscal year, the agent or direct
 operation shall file with [send by certified mail, postage prepaid,
 to] the department one copy of the audit report with a transmittal
 letter. The agent shall also send a copy of the audit report and
 transmittal letter to each title insurance company that the agent
 represents.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2651.152(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than the 90th day after the date of the end of
 the title insurance company's fiscal year, the company shall file
 with [send by certified mail, postage prepaid, to] the department
 one copy of the audit report.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *