Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4201 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/23/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 23, 2021       TO: Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4201 by Martinez (Relating to a feasibility study on the colocation of federal and state motor vehicle inspection facilities at ports of entry.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4201, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($250,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2022($250,000)2023$02024$02025$02026$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12022($250,000)2023$02024$02025$02026$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would require the Texas A&M Transportation Institute (TTI), in consultation with the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) and Texas Department of Public Safety (DPS), to conduct a study on the feasibility of erecting and maintaining a colocated federal and state inspection facility at each port of entry in this state for the inspection of motor vehicles for compliance with federal and state commercial motor vehicle regulations. The bill would require TTI to report the results of the study and any recommendations to the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration no later than December 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill would expire on January 1, 2023.  The bill would take effect on September 1, 2021.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 23, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4201 by Martinez (Relating to a feasibility study on the colocation of federal and state motor vehicle inspection facilities at ports of entry.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4201 by Martinez (Relating to a feasibility study on the colocation of federal and state motor vehicle inspection facilities at ports of entry.), As Introduced

 Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation

 Honorable Terry Canales, Chair, House Committee on Transportation

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB4201 by Martinez (Relating to a feasibility study on the colocation of federal and state motor vehicle inspection facilities at ports of entry.), As Introduced 

 HB4201 by Martinez (Relating to a feasibility study on the colocation of federal and state motor vehicle inspection facilities at ports of entry.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4201, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($250,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4201, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($250,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2022 ($250,000)
2023 $0
2024 $0
2025 $0
2026 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2022 ($250,000)
2023 $0
2024 $0
2025 $0
2026 $0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Texas A&M Transportation Institute (TTI), in consultation with the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) and Texas Department of Public Safety (DPS), to conduct a study on the feasibility of erecting and maintaining a colocated federal and state inspection facility at each port of entry in this state for the inspection of motor vehicles for compliance with federal and state commercial motor vehicle regulations. The bill would require TTI to report the results of the study and any recommendations to the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration no later than December 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill would expire on January 1, 2023.  The bill would take effect on September 1, 2021.



The bill would take effect on September 1, 2021.

 Methodology

Based on the information provided by TTI, it is assumed TTI would incur a one-time cost of $250,000 from the General Revenue Fund in fiscal year 2022 to conduct the study required by the bill.   Based on the information provided by TxDOT and DPS, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with assisting in the study to be conducted by TTI could be absorbed within the agencies' existing resources.



Based on the information provided by TxDOT and DPS, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with assisting in the study to be conducted by TTI could be absorbed within the agencies' existing resources.

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 405 Department of Public Safety, 601 Department of Transportation, 727 Texas A&M Transportation Institute

405 Department of Public Safety, 601 Department of Transportation, 727 Texas A&M Transportation Institute

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AAL, TG, MB

JMc, AAL, TG, MB