Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4242 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Meyer (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 4242
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 21, 2021, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 21, 2021, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the
 Texas Economic Development Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 313.007, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 313.007.  EXPIRATION.  Subchapters B and C expire
 December 31, 2024 [2022].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *