Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4293 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2021

                    H.B. No. 4293


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a court reminder program for criminal
 defendants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 75, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. COURT REMINDER PROGRAM
 Sec. 75.601.  ESTABLISHMENT OF STATE PROGRAM FOR
 PARTICIPATING COUNTIES. (a) The Office of Court Administration of
 the Texas Judicial System shall develop and make available to each
 county a court reminder program that allows the county to send a
 text message to notify criminal defendants of scheduled court
 appearances. The purposes of the program must include:
 (1)  reducing costs associated with defendants who fail
 to appear for a scheduled court appearance;
 (2)  improving the efficiency of courts in this state;
 (3)  reminding criminal defendants to appear at each
 scheduled court appearance; and
 (4)  reducing the number of criminal defendants who are
 confined in a county jail due solely to the defendant's failure to
 appear for a scheduled court appearance.
 (b)  The program must:
 (1)  be available to each county at no cost;
 (2)  comply with applicable state and federal laws
 requiring the consent of an individual before sending a reminder by
 text message;
 (3)  provide text message reminders for each court
 appearance of a defendant who has access to a device with the
 technological capability of receiving text messages and provides
 the court administrator with an operational phone number for the
 device;
 (4)  document each occurrence of a criminal defendant
 receiving a text message reminder;
 (5)  identify criminal defendants with scheduled court
 appearances who lack access to devices with the technological
 capability of receiving text messages;
 (6)  document the number of criminal defendants who
 fail to appear at scheduled court appearances after being sent one
 or more text message reminders;
 (7)  include the technological capability, at the
 discretion of the local administrative judge, to provide additional
 information to criminal defendants concerning scheduled court
 appearances, such as the location of the court appearance,
 available transportation options, and procedures for defendants
 who are unable to attend court appearances;
 (8)  support partnerships with local law enforcement
 agencies, local governments, and local public defenders in
 accordance with the purposes described by Subsection (a); and
 (9)  provide one or more publicly available Internet
 websites through which criminal defendants may request text
 reminders.
 Sec. 75.602.  ESTABLISHMENT OF COUNTY PROGRAMS. (a) The
 justices of the justice courts and judges of the county courts,
 statutory county courts, and district courts with jurisdiction over
 criminal cases in each county may establish a court reminder
 program that allows the county to send a text message to notify
 criminal defendants of scheduled court appearances.
 (b)  In developing the court reminder program, the justices
 and judges may join the state program developed under Section
 75.601 or develop a county program that allows the county to send
 text message notifications to criminal defendants and that complies
 with the requirements of Section 75.601(b).
 Sec. 75.603.  MUNICIPAL PROGRAM. (a) The Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System, or the justices of the
 justice courts and judges of the county courts, statutory county
 courts, and district courts with jurisdiction over criminal cases
 in each county, may partner with municipalities and local law
 enforcement agencies to allow:
 (1)  individuals to whom a peace officer issues a
 citation and releases to receive text message reminders of
 scheduled court appearances; and
 (2)  criminal defendants in municipal court to receive
 text message reminders of scheduled court appearances.
 (b)  Any municipality that partners with the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall pay all costs of
 sending reminders to municipal criminal defendants, including the
 costs of linking the municipal court database with the state court
 administrator database.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the Office
 of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall develop
 and make available the court reminder program as required by
 Section 75.601, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the office may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4293 was passed by the House on May
 13, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 123, Nays 19, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4293 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 118, Nays 25,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4293 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor