Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4295 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Bell of Kaufman (Senate Sponsor - Johnson) H.B. No. 4295
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authorized release and confidentiality of an
 autopsy report.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11, Article 49.25, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The medical examiner may release a copy of an autopsy
 report of a deceased person to any organ and tissue procurement
 organization, hospital, or other covered entity as defined by
 Section 181.001, Health and Safety Code, that treated the deceased
 person before death or procured any anatomical gift from the body of
 the deceased person. The release of a report under this subsection
 is not considered a disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 A report obtained under this subsection is confidential and not
 subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *