Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4477 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4477
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the financial exploitation of certain vulnerable
 adults.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 281.001(5), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (5)  "Vulnerable adult" means:
 (A)  an elderly person as that term is defined by
 Section 48.002, Human Resources Code; or
 (B)  a person with a disability as that term is
 defined by Section 48.002, Human Resources Code[; or
 [(C)  an individual receiving services as that
 term is defined by rule by the executive commissioner of the Health
 and Human Services Commission as authorized by Section 48.251(b),
 Human Resources Code].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 281.004(a) and (b), Finance Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, [if] a financial
 institution [submits a report of suspected financial exploitation
 of a vulnerable adult to the department under Section 281.002(b),
 the financial institution]:
 (1)  may place a hold on any transaction that[:
 [(A)]  involves an account of a [the] vulnerable
 adult if[; and
 [(B)]  the financial institution:
 (A)  submits a report of suspected financial
 exploitation of the vulnerable adult to the department under
 Section 281.002(b); and
 (B)  has cause to believe the transaction is
 related to the suspected financial exploitation alleged in the
 report; and
 (2)  must place a hold on any transaction involving an
 account of a [the] vulnerable adult if the hold is requested by the
 department or a law enforcement agency.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (c), a hold placed on any
 transaction under Subsection (a) expires on the 10th business day
 after the date the hold is placed [the financial institution
 submits the report under Section 281.002(b)].
 SECTION 3.  Sections 4004.355(a) and (b), Government Code,
 as effective January 1, 2022, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, [if] a dealer or
 investment adviser [submits reports of suspected financial
 exploitation of a vulnerable adult to the commissioner and the
 department under Section 4004.352(b), the dealer or investment
 adviser]:
 (1)  may place a hold on any transaction that[:
 [(A)]  involves an account of a [the] vulnerable
 adult if[; and
 [(B)]  the dealer or investment adviser:
 (A)  submits a report of suspected financial
 exploitation of the vulnerable adult to the commissioner and the
 department under Section 4004.352(b); and
 (B)  has cause to believe the transaction is
 related to the suspected financial exploitation alleged in the
 report; and
 (2)  must place a hold on any transaction involving an
 account of a [the] vulnerable adult if the hold is requested by the
 commissioner, the department, or a law enforcement agency.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (c), a hold placed on any
 transaction under Subsection (a) expires on the 10th business day
 after the date the hold is placed [the dealer or investment adviser
 submits the reports under Section 4004.352(b)].
 SECTION 4.  Subsections G and H, Section 45, The Securities
 Act (Article 581-45, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to
 read as follows:
 G.  Notwithstanding any other law, [if] a dealer or
 investment adviser [submits reports of suspected financial
 exploitation of a vulnerable adult to the Securities Commissioner
 and the department under Subsection C of this section, the dealer or
 investment adviser]:
 (1)  may place a hold on any transaction that[:
 [(A)]  involves an account of a [the] vulnerable
 adult if[; and
 [(B)]  the dealer or investment adviser:
 (A)  submits a report of suspected financial
 exploitation of the vulnerable adult to the Securities Commissioner
 and the department under Subsection C of this section; and
 (B)  has cause to believe the transaction is
 related to the suspected financial exploitation alleged in the
 report; and
 (2)  must place a hold on any transaction involving an
 account of a [the] vulnerable adult if the hold is requested by the
 Securities Commissioner, the department, or a law enforcement
 agency.
 H.  Subject to Subsection I of this section, a hold placed on
 any transaction under Subsection G of this section expires on the
 10th business day after the date the hold is placed [the dealer or
 investment adviser submits the reports under Subsection C of this
 section].
 SECTION 5.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *