Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4562 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/19/2021

                    By: Anchia H.B. No. 4562


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extreme weather emergency preparedness of
 facilities providing gas or fuel to be used in the production of an
 electric service; requiring reporting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 81, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 81.073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.073.  WEATHER EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS.  (a) In this
 section, "extreme weather emergency" means a period when:
 (1)  the previous day's highest temperature did not
 exceed 10 degrees Fahrenheit and the temperature is predicted to
 remain at or below that level for the next 24 hours according to the
 nearest National Weather Service reports; or
 (2)  the National Weather Service issues a heat
 advisory for any county in the relevant service territory, or when
 such an advisory has been issued on any one of the previous two
 calendar 16 days.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall require each provider of
 gas supply for generation in the ERCOT power region to:
 (1)  implement measures to prepare generation
 facilities, including weatherization protocols and standards, to
 provide adequate supply during an extreme weather emergency;
 (2)  make all reasonable efforts to prevent
 interruptions of gas supply during an extreme weather emergency;
 (3)  reestablish supply within the shortest possible
 time, should an interruption occur due to an extreme weather
 emergency; and
 (4)  make reasonable efforts to manage emergencies
 resulting from a failure of service caused by an extreme weather
 emergency, including issuing instructions to its employees on
 procedures to be followed in the event of an extreme weather
 emergency.
 (c)  The rules adopted under Subsection (b) may not neglect
 any local neighborhood or geographic area, including rural areas,
 communities of less than 1000 people, and low-income areas.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 81, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 81.074 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.074.  REPORTING INCIDENTS. (a) In this section,
 "extreme weather emergency" has the meaning assigned by Section
 81.073, Natural Resources Code.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall require each provider of
 gas producers providing supply intended for generation in the ERCOT
 power region to:
 (1)  Register with the Transmission Distribution
 Utility serving the power for the location of the gas wellhead,
 equipment or facility, as critical infrastructure.
 (2)  Contact the Transmission Distribution Utility
 providing the power to the gas wellhead, equipment or facility
 within 4 hours after power is lost during an extreme weather
 emergency.
 (3)  Report outages of power to gas wellheads,
 equipment or a facility providing gas for supply of electric
 generation in the ERCOT region within 4 hours of notification or
 knowledge of power loss and during an extreme weather emergency;
 (c)  The commission shall require incident reports for power
 outages that result in a loss of gas supply intended for electric
 generation in the ERCOT market.
 (d)  The commission shall develop an electronic process of
 filing all incident reports.
 (e)  The commission shall provide immediate and free access
 to the reporting of incidents. This shall be provided on the
 commission website for viewing as reports are made.
 (f)  The commission shall develop the electronic reporting
 system and provide the website access by November 1, 2021. The
 information included shall begin with incident reports filed with
 the commission beginning January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  The Railroad Commission of Texas shall adopt
 rules as required by Sections 81.073 and 81.074, Natural Resources
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.