Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB572 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Lucio, West) H.B. No. 572
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 572 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Texas Education Agency on
 competency-based educational programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.928 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.928.  STUDY ON COMPETENCY-BASED EDUCATIONAL
 PROGRAMS. (a) The agency shall conduct a study on the
 implementation of competency-based educational programs by public
 schools in the state.
 (b)  The study must analyze methods of:
 (1)  providing funding for competency-based
 educational programs that do not rely on average daily attendance;
 (2)  assessing the performance of competency-based
 educational programs under the public school accountability
 system; and
 (3)  providing competency-based educational programs
 to nontraditional students, including adult students.
 (c)  The agency may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any public or private source to fund the study.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the agency shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature a report on the results of the
 study and any recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *