Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB572 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2021

                    H.B. No. 572


 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of students enrolled in a dropout
 recovery school as students at risk of dropping out of school for
 purposes of compensatory, intensive, and accelerated instruction
 and to a study by the Texas Education Agency on competency-based
 educational programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.081(d), Education Code, as amended by
 Chapters 403 (S.B. 1746), 597 (S.B. 668), and 1060 (H.B. 1051), Acts
 of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is reenacted and
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  For purposes of this section, "student at risk of
 dropping out of school" includes each student who:
 (1)  is under 26 years of age and who:
 (A)  was not advanced from one grade level to the
 next for one or more school years;
 (B)  if the student is in grade 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, or
 12, did not maintain an average equivalent to 70 on a scale of 100 in
 two or more subjects in the foundation curriculum during a semester
 in the preceding or current school year or is not maintaining such
 an average in two or more subjects in the foundation curriculum in
 the current semester;
 (C)  did not perform satisfactorily on an
 assessment instrument administered to the student under Subchapter
 B, Chapter 39, and who has not in the previous or current school
 year subsequently performed on that instrument or another
 appropriate instrument at a level equal to at least 110 percent of
 the level of satisfactory performance on that instrument;
 (D)  if the student is in prekindergarten,
 kindergarten, or grade 1, 2, or 3, did not perform satisfactorily on
 a readiness test or assessment instrument administered during the
 current school year;
 (E)  is pregnant or is a parent;
 (F)  has been placed in an alternative education
 program in accordance with Section 37.006 during the preceding or
 current school year;
 (G)  has been expelled in accordance with Section
 37.007 during the preceding or current school year;
 (H)  is currently on parole, probation, deferred
 prosecution, or other conditional release;
 (I)  was previously reported through the Public
 Education Information Management System (PEIMS) to have dropped out
 of school;
 (J)  is a student of limited English proficiency,
 as defined by Section 29.052;
 (K)  is in the custody or care of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services or has, during the current school
 year, been referred to the department by a school official, officer
 of the juvenile court, or law enforcement official;
 (L)  is homeless;
 (M)  resided in the preceding school year or
 resides in the current school year in a residential placement
 facility in the district, including a detention facility, substance
 abuse treatment facility, emergency shelter, psychiatric hospital,
 halfway house, cottage home operation, specialized child-care
 home, or general residential operation; [or]
 (N) [(14)]  has been incarcerated or has a parent
 or guardian who has been incarcerated, within the lifetime of the
 student, in a penal institution as defined by Section 1.07, Penal
 Code; or
 (O)  is enrolled in a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school, or a campus of a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school, that is designated as a dropout
 recovery school under Section 39.0548; or
 (2)  regardless of the student's age, participates in
 an adult education program provided under a high school diploma and
 industry certification charter school program under Section
 29.259.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.928 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.928.  STUDY ON COMPETENCY-BASED EDUCATIONAL
 PROGRAMS. (a) The agency shall conduct a study on the
 implementation of competency-based educational programs by public
 schools in the state.
 (b)  The study must analyze methods of:
 (1)  providing funding for competency-based
 educational programs that do not rely on average daily attendance;
 (2)  assessing the performance of competency-based
 educational programs under the public school accountability
 system; and
 (3)  providing competency-based educational programs
 to nontraditional students, including adult students.
 (c)  The agency may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any public or private source to fund the study.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the agency shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature a report on the results of the
 study and any recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Education Agency is required to
 implement Section 29.928, Education Code, as added by this Act,
 only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
 purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the agency may, but is not required
 to, implement that section using other money available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 572 was passed by the House on May 14,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 128, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 572 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 572 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 138,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 572 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 572 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor