Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB619 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2021

                    H.B. No. 619


 AN ACT
 relating to developing a strategic plan to support the child-care
 workforce.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 302.0062 to read as follows:
 Sec. 302.0062.  STRATEGIC PLAN TO SUPPORT CHILD-CARE
 WORKFORCE. (a) The commission shall prepare a strategic plan for
 improving the quality of the infant, toddler, preschool, and
 school-age child-care workforce in this state.  The strategic plan
 must include:
 (1)  recommendations for local workforce development
 boards to improve, sustain, and support the child-care workforce;
 (2)  recommendations for increasing compensation for
 and reducing turnover of child-care workers;
 (3)  recommendations for eliminating pay disparities
 in the child-care workforce;
 (4)  recommendations for increasing paid opportunities
 for professional development and education for child-care workers,
 including apprenticeships;
 (5)  best practices from local workforce development
 boards in this state and other programs designed to support
 child-care workers;
 (6)  recommendations for increasing participation in
 the Texas Early Childhood Professional Development System;
 (7)  recommendations for public and private
 institutions of higher education to:
 (A)  increase the use of articulation agreements
 with school districts and open-enrollment charter schools; and
 (B)  assist in the education and training of
 child-care workers;
 (8)  specific recommendations for improving the infant
 and toddler child-care workforce; and
 (9)  a timeline and benchmarks for the commission and
 local workforce development boards to implement recommendations
 from the strategic plan.
 (b)  The commission shall convene a workgroup to assist the
 commission in developing the plan. The workgroup shall include:
 (1)  child-care providers;
 (2)  community stakeholders; and
 (3)  child-care workers.
 (c)  The commission shall use the following information in
 creating the plan:
 (1)  demographic data of child-care workers in this
 state, including:
 (A)  the race, ethnicity, gender, and educational
 attainment of child-care workers; and
 (B)  the ages of the children the worker serves;
 (2)  compensation data for child-care workers
 disaggregated by race, ethnicity, gender, and educational
 attainment;
 (3)  the information described by Subdivisions (1) and
 (2) for a representative sample set of child-care facilities in the
 state; and
 (4)  information provided by the workgroup established
 under Subsection (b).
 (d)  The commission shall provide the strategic plan
 prepared under this section to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (e)  The commission shall update the strategic plan prepared
 under this section every three years.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2022, the Texas
 Workforce Commission shall make the strategic plan required by
 Section 302.0062, Labor Code, as added by this Act, available to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 619 was passed by the House on April
 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 91, Nays 54, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 619 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 95, Nays 47, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 619 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays
 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor