Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB686 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Moody, et al. H.B. No. 686
 (Senate Sponsor - Lucio, Eckhardt, Hall)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 686 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the release on parole of certain youthful offenders;
 changing parole eligibility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 508.1415 to read as follows:
 Sec. 508.1415.  ADDITIONAL PAROLE CONSIDERATIONS FOR
 YOUTHFUL OFFENDERS. (a) This section applies only to the
 consideration for release on parole of an inmate who was younger
 than 17 years of age at the time the offense for which the inmate is
 eligible for release on parole was committed.
 (b)  In determining whether to release an inmate described by
 Subsection (a) on parole, a parole panel shall assess the growth and
 maturity of the inmate, taking into consideration:
 (1)  the diminished culpability of juveniles, as
 compared to that of adults;
 (2)  the hallmark features of youth; and
 (3)  the greater capacity of juveniles for change, as
 compared to that of adults.
 (c)  The board shall adopt a policy establishing factors for
 a parole panel to consider when reviewing for release on parole an
 inmate to whom this section applies to ensure that the inmate is
 provided a meaningful opportunity to obtain release. The policy
 must:
 (1)  consider the age of the inmate at the time of the
 commission of the offense as a mitigating factor in favor of
 granting release on parole;
 (2)  permit persons having knowledge of the inmate
 before the inmate committed the offense or having knowledge of the
 inmate's growth and maturity after the offense was committed to
 submit statements regarding the inmate for consideration by the
 parole panel; and
 (3)  establish a mechanism for the outcome of a
 comprehensive mental health evaluation conducted by an expert
 qualified by education and clinical training in adolescent mental
 health issues to be considered by the parole panel.
 (d)  This section does not:
 (1)  affect the rights granted under this chapter or
 Article 56A.051, Code of Criminal Procedure, to a victim, guardian
 of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim; or
 (2)  create a legal cause of action.
 SECTION 2.  Section 508.145, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (d-2) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  An inmate serving a life sentence under Section
 12.31(a)(1), Penal Code, for a capital felony is not eligible for
 release on parole until the actual calendar time the inmate has
 served, without consideration of good conduct time, equals 30 [40]
 calendar years, except that an inmate serving a life sentence under
 Section 12.31(a)(1), Penal Code, for a capital felony under Section
 19.03(a)(1) or (7) of that code is not eligible for release on
 parole until the actual calendar time the inmate has served,
 without consideration of good conduct time, equals 40 calendar
 years.
 (d-2)(1)  This subsection applies only to an inmate who:
 (A)  is serving a sentence for:
 (i)  a first degree felony described by
 Article 42A.054(a), Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (ii)  an offense under Section 20A.03 or
 71.023, Penal Code; or
 (iii)  a first degree felony under Section
 71.02, Penal Code; and
 (B)  was younger than 17 years of age at the time
 the offense was committed.
 (2)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 section, an inmate described by Subdivision (1) is not eligible for
 release on parole until the inmate's actual calendar time served,
 without consideration of good conduct time, equals 20 calendar
 years or one-half of the applicable time provided by this section,
 whichever is less, but in no event is the inmate eligible for
 release on parole in less than four calendar years unless the inmate
 would otherwise be eligible for release on parole under another
 provision of this section.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *