Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB723 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2021

                    By: Patterson, et al. H.B. No. 723
 (Senate Sponsor - Paxton, Johnson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; April 26, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of a modification to the medical certification
 information on certain death certificates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as Marilyn's Law.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 193, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 193.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 193.012.  NOTICE OF CERTAIN DEATH CERTIFICATE
 AMENDMENTS. For a death certificate that is not a pending death
 certificate, a person who submits to the department a request for an
 amendment to modify the medical certification information on the
 certificate shall provide in the manner prescribed by the
 department written notice of the modification to a decedent's next
 of kin.
 SECTION 3.  Section 193.012, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a death certificate for which an
 amendment to modify the medical certification information is
 requested on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *